Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wagner, Paul, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Webb, Lenden F, against Schwedler, Carl J, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2020 |
Category20: Unlimited Enforcement Of Judgment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Bankruptcy filed (Post-judgment) BANKRUPTCY NTC RECD Notes: BANKRUPTCY NOTICE RECD W/DIST/ NO DISTRIBUTION FOR DEFT CARL J SCHWEDLER, FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
701 DEBTOR EXAM *Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
CIVIL LAW AND MOTION MINUTE ORDER *Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: CARL J SCHWEDLER W/ OEX ON 04/17/20 |
|
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Application for Order for Judgment Debtor Exam APP/ORD DEBTOR EXAM |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: MONEY JUDGMENT YOLO COUNTY $83,737.09 |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ Notes: $82,481.81 | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed SUB DUCES TECUM FILD Notes: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AT EXAM FILED BY PLTFF |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: DOCUMENT SENT TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.