Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Roca, Blanca Elizabeth, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Khorsandi, Arash, against Ean Holdings, Llc, Lake, Danielle, Paragon Industries, Inc, represented by Melton, David A, Miller, Adam I, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2020 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Demurrer / Motion to Strike
Date: September 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury 4 DAYS Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Motion TO COMPEL AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Motion
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF BLANCA ELIZABETH ROCA'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT DANIELLE LAKE'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice OF COURT SETTING TRIAL DATE AND TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO CAL SHELF |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF CASSANDRA J. NINKE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DANIELLE LAKE S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF S DOCUMENT PRODUCTION IN RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion - $60 Fee DEFENDANT DANIELLE LAKE S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF BLANCA ELIZABETH ROCA S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.