Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tapia, Francisco, Tapia, Karina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Curtis, Lance J, against Does, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateMay 13, 2020 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
*Case Management Conference
Date: February 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference /DISM Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Law and Motion Minute Order *Case Management Conference /DISM Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY PLTFFS |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Jury Fees Posted | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE Notes: FAP; JUDGE MCADAM |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet UNINSURED MOTORIST |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed UNLIMITED CIVIL COMP Notes: UNLIMITED CIVIL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.