Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bdc Davis Lp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Roschko, Brandi S, against Metro Unlimited Wireless, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2020 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Default Entered | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default AGAINST METRO UNLIMITED WIRELESS, INC. DBA THE MOBILE COMPANY |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGMENT FILED BY PLAINTTIFFS | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service BY MAIL; SERVED METRO UNLIMITED WIRELESS, INC W/ SUMM & CMPLT ON 06/03/2020; NAR SIGNED ON 08/12/2020 BY ANTHONY LOSS ON BEHALF OF DEFT METRO UNLIMITED WIRELESS, INC |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service BY MAIL; SERVED METRO UNLIMITED WIRELESS, INC W/ SUMM & CMPLT ON 06/03/2020; NAR SIGNED ON 06/12/2020 BY ANTHONY LOSS ON BEHALF OF DEFT METRO UNLIMITED WIRELESS, INC |
|
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE Notes: FAP; JUDGE MCADAM |
|
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.