Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
North, Brandy filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2020 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time17 days |
*Order to Show Cause
Date: March 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: DEBBLE VALIM WITH ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 3/17/20 |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
718 OSC* *Order to Show Cause DENIED TRO Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: DEBBIE VALIM WITH NOTICE OF HEARING, REQUEST FOR ORDER TO STOP HARASSMENT (CIVIL HARASSMENT), ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ORDER TO STOP HARASSMENT (CIVIL HARASSMENT) ON 3/2/20 |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 3/12/2020 AT 9AM IN D10 |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Denied Restraining Order TRO DENIED Notes: - TRO DENIED PENDING HEARING |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | RELATED CASE FILES Notes: UFC - RELATED CASE FILES: PT20-157 (DISM) | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: TRO AND NOTICE OF HEARING SENT TO JUDGE MCADAM |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet OTHER PETITION |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE Notes: FAP; JUDGE MCADAM |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition to Prevent Civil Harassment (Other) and Response PETN* Notes: REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.