Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Swearingen-Ojuri, Amber I, against Krause, James A., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2020 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Case Management Conference
Date: February 22, 2021*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition
Date: January 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Law and Motion Minute Order *Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition RE SANCTIONS Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause RE SANCTIONS TO PLTF |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing OSC & CMC MIN ORD |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: JAMES KRAUSE WITH THE SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED ORDERS, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET, DECLARATION OF VENUE ON 03/02/2020 AT 8:11 PM |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet COLL/$$ OWED/OPN BK |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION OF VENUE |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed - DO NOT USE FOR CLERK EDITION ONLY LIMITED COLLECT COMP Notes: LIMITED COLLECTIONS CASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.