Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Defendis, Anthony, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by To, Be Entered, against O'Brien, Dennis, O'Brien, Rosemary, represented by Muller, Joseph B, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wolk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wolk Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2020 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury 5 DAYS Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANTHONY DEFENDIS |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY DEFTS DENNIS O'BRIEN AND ROSEMARY O'BRIEN |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT MINUTE ORDER *Case Management Conference Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable) ADVANCED JURY FEES Notes: ADVANCED JURY FEES PAID DEFENDANTS DENNIS O'BRIEN AND ROSEMARY O'BRIEN |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY DEFENDANTS DENNIS O'BRIEN AND ROSEMARY O'BRIEN |
|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable) ADVANCED JURY FEES Notes: ADVANCED JURY FEES PAID BY PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.