Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kennard, Robert Scott, against Saetern, Muey K, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wolk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wolk Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2020 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
*Case Management Conference
Date: February 22, 2021*Case Management Conference
Date: April 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Cont from 2-22-2021 Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Case Management Statement |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED:MEUY K SAETERN WITH SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET, AND CASE MANAGEMENT PACKET ON 02/25/2020 AT 6:29 PM |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet COLL/$$ OWED/OPN BK |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed LIMITED COLLECT COMP Notes: LIMITED COLLECTIONS CASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.