Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pogosian, Jack H, against Chambers, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Samuel T. McAdam presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamuel T. McAdam Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management383 days |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2019 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time110 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: SUBSERVED: JOSEPH CHAMBERS WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON 4/14/2019 |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE Notes: FAP; JUDGE WILLIAMS |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet COLL/$$ OWED/OPN BK |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed - DO NOT USE FOR CLERK EDITION ONLY LIMITED COLLECT COMP Notes: LIMITED COLLECTIONS CASE |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 395 (B): VENUE FOR PERSONAL, FAMILY OR HOUSEHOLD OBLIGATIONS |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION RE: REDUCTION IN FILING FEE |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed LIMITED COLLECT COMP Notes: LIMITED COLLECTIONS CASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.