Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fluker, Dorothy M filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Peter M. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter M. Williams Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2019 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
*Order to Show Cause
Date: October 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
718 OSC* *Order to Show Cause NAME CHANGE Judge: Williams, Peter M. |
|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Comment DROPPED FR CALENDAR Notes: NON APP. |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
CIVIL LAW AND MOTION MINUTE ORDER *Order to Show Cause FOR NAME CHANGE Judge: Williams, Peter M. |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | LODGING OF DOCUMENTS Notes: DECREE CHANGING NAME | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | RELATED CASE FILES Notes: UFC - RELATED CASE FILES PT19-623 | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
CIVIL LAW AND MOTION MINUTE ORDER *Order to Show Cause NAME CHANGE Judge: Williams, Peter M. |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Filed AMEND PETITION Notes: AMENDED PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: DOCUMENT SENT TO JUDGE WILLIAMS, OSC |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.