Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Deangelo, Veronica filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Richardson, Paul K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Paul K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2019 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time35 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
CIVIL LAW AND MOTION MINUTE ORDER *Order to Show Cause Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
CIVIL LAW AND MOTION MINUTE ORDER *Order to Show Cause TRO Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion CONT BY PARTY'S MTN Notes: RESP |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing - DV REISSUE TRO Notes: REISSUE TRO - ORDER ON REQ TO CONT HRG |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Peremptory Challenge Filed 170.6 CHALL AGAINST* Notes: 170.6 CHALLENGE JDG WILLIAMS BY RESPONDENT IS HONORED |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: FILED BY DEFT |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE Notes: FAP; JUDGE RICHARDSON |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Peremptory Challenge Filed 170 CHALLENGE FILED Notes: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AGAINST JUDGE WILLIAMS FILED BY RESPONDENT |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE Notes: FAP; JUDGE WILLIAMS Action: VAC Action Cmnt: PER 170.6 |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 4/15/19 AT 9AM IN D8 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.