Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Alliant Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Vanlochem, Michael D, against Ortega, Eliecer Lopez, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Samuel T. McAdam presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management126 days |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2019 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions140 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time221 days |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case
Date: October 26, 2020*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case
Date: July 10, 2023*Motion
Date: October 07, 2019*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case
Date: October 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case
Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice FILED BY ATTNY FOR PLTF -Notice of Continuance of Judgment Debtor Exam (Comment) |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion - Plaintiff |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To COMISSIONER TAYLOR/TASKS |
|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Examination - Civil 11/27/23 HRG |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Law and Motion Minute Order *Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case Judge: Assigned, Judge 2 |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Arden Burstein appears telephonically |
|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Application OEX DEBTOR ELIECER LOPEZ ORTEGA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.