Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Crown Asset Management, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Farmar, Law Group, Pc, against Peters, Emma, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management381 days |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2018 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions217 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time217 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISFIED |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: LOS ANGELES |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: $26.50 ACCRUED INTEREST |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: AS OF 11/26/18 | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL W/O PREJ |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: OF DEBT BUYER CCP1788.60 |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | FILED* Notes: ASSIGNMENT | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT* Notes: ON ACCT | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal of Does DISM OF "DOES" Notes: 1-10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.