Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Zeller, Rhapsody, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against City Of Woodland, County Of Yolo, National Future Farmers Of America, Pioneer High School, Woodland Joint Unified School District, (total of 6) See All represented by Breen, Kelly M, Broomand, I Hooshie, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management119 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2018 |
Category23: Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions248 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time368 days |
*Ex Parte
Date: November 25, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM Notes: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
January 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Demurrer / Motion to Strike DEMURRER Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause RE DISMISSAL Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited ANSWER CV/FL/PB Notes: DEFENDANT NATIONAL FFA ORGANIZATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: REQ FOR DISMISSAL |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: DOCUMENT SENT TO JUDGE REQ FOR DISMISSAL |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities MEMO OF P & A Notes: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS CITY OF WOODLAND AND COUTNY OF YOLO'S OPPOSITION TO PLTFF'S BRIEFING IN RESPONSE TO OSC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.