Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bolin, Marvin, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mikhov, Steve B, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial472 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time714 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Motion TO STRIKE/TAX FILED BY PLAINTIFF Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Objection - No Fee DEFENDANT FCA US LLC'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF STEVE MIKHOV IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed DEFENDANT FCA US LLC'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE/TAX MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF THOMAS J. WALSH FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FCA US LLC'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE/TAX MEMORANDUM OF COSTS | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Objection - No Fee DEFENDANT FCA US LLC'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF STEVE MIKHOV IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COSTS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TAX PLAINTIFF'S COSTS |
|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition PLAINTIFF S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF S COSTS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TAX PLAINTIFF S COSTS |
|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Objection - No Fee PLAINTIFF S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF ARIELLE E. BROWN |
|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF STEVE MIKHOV IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF S COSTS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TAX PLAINTIFF S COSTS | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Motion ATTORNEY'S FEES & COSTS Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.