Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Td Bank Usa, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Vlachos, Michael, against Smith, Ena C, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management388 days |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2018 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time336 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Returned DECL OF NON SERVICE Notes: DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE RE: ENA C SMITH |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Returned DECL OF NON SERVICE Notes: DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE AS TO ENA SMITH |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet COLL/$$ OWED/OPN BK |
|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed - DO NOT USE FOR CLERK EDITION ONLY LIMITED COLLECT COMP Notes: LIMITED COLLECTIONS CASE |
|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed LIMITED COLLECT COMP Notes: LIMITED COLLECTIONS CASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.