Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dipiero, Anthony, against Elizondo, Amber Josefina, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management388 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2018 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions95 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time95 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISFIED |
|
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: PLACER; $2,579.20 |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ | |
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL IN SUPPORT* Notes: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DFLT JDGMT |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: INTEREST, COSTS, ATTY FEES |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: AS TO AMBER JOSEFINA ELIZONDO AS OF 3/18/19 | |
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST AMBER JOSEFINA ELIZONDO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.