Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hamoud, A Samad filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Thomas E. Warriner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 17, 2018 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time49 days |
*Order to Show Cause
Date: December 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
718 OSC* *Order to Show Cause NAME CHANGE Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTED* Notes: MOTION GRANTED - TO CHANGE NAME | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof / Affidavit of Publication POS BY PUBLICATION Notes: PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION AT THE NEWS LEDGER ON 11/7/18, 11/14/18, 11/21/18 AND 11/28/18 |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | LODGING OF DOCUMENTS Notes: DECREE CHANGING NAME | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME |
|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition to Prevent Civil Harassment (Other) and Response PETN* Notes: PET FOR CHANGE OF NAME |
|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet OTHER PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.