Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case against Cheung, Wing Chit, L & W Builders Inc, Wang, Kai Qin, Wang, Kevin, Wang, Mark, (total of 7) See All represented by Cohen, Joshua D, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management126 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 27, 2017 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Time To Trial547 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions65 days |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Order to Show Cause
Date: May 21, 2019*Motion
Date: February 27, 2019*Order to Show Cause
Date: May 21, 2019*Order to Show Cause
Date: March 08, 2019*Motion
Date: February 04, 2020*Demurrer / Motion to Strike
Date: December 06, 2019*Motion
Date: December 30, 2019Stipulation & Order
Date: January 15, 2021Ruling
Date: January 08, 2021*Motion
Date: April 08, 2021*Ex Parte
Date: May 20, 2021Ruling
Date: July 16, 2021*Motion
Date: July 16, 2021*Trial: Court
Date: December 16, 2019*Trial: Court
Date: December 18, 2019*Trial: Court
Date: December 11, 2019*Trial: Court
Date: December 12, 2019*Trial: Court
Date: January 14, 2020Certificate of Mailing
Date: January 15, 2021*Trial: Court
Date: February 10, 2020*Trial: Court
Date: March 09, 2020*Trial: Court
Date: March 10, 2020Received
Date: January 12, 2021*Motion
Date: February 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Motion FOR ATTORNEY FEES (TO BE HEARD WITH JUDGE MOCK) Judge: Mock, Stephen L |
|
February 10, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Case: People v. Wang Case No. CV-2017-1989 Hearing Date: February 10, 2022 Department Twelve 1:30 p.m. Defendants and cross-complainants Wang Brothers Investments LLC, Mark Wang, and Kevin Wang’s (“de... | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Remittitur Filed APPEAL DISMISSED |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF MICHAEL R HUDSON IN SUPPORT OF THE PEOPLES MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, PURSUANT TO CCP 2033.420 |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed SUR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE PEOPLES MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, PURSUANT TO CCP 2033.420 |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED ( SEE SERVICE LIST) WITH OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS RENEWED MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS ON 12/20/2021 |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF KATHERINE KAO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAITIFFS RENEWED MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICAIL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS RENEWED MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS RENEWED MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.