Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hernandez, Derrick, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by To, Be Entered, against Dignity Health, represented by Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton, Llp, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Kathleen M. White presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management133 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2017 |
Category15: Unlimited Other Employment |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time259 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL *Trial: Jury JURY TRIAL 5 DAYS Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference TRIAL READINESS CONF Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference MSC Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE Notes: MSC SET FOR 1/28/19N @ 10:30 AM IN D2 IS VAC & RESET TO 1/29/19 @ 1030 AM IN D2 |
|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT MINUTE ORDER *Case Management Conference Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY PLTFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.