Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hunt & Henriques, against Patnelli, Arthur E., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management389 days |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2017 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time123 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
July 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Returned DECL OF NON SERVICE Notes: DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE AS TO ARTHUR E. PATNELLI |
|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet COLL/$$ OWED/OPN BK |
|
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed LIMITED COLLECT COMP Notes: LIMITED COLLECTIONS CASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.