Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Resolution Fund Management, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by To, Be Entered, against Loakimedes, Christian, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Steven M. Basha presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2016 |
Category26: Unlimited Other Real Property |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time166 days |
*Order to Show Cause
Date: March 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Basha, Steven M |
|
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: REQUEST FOR DIMISSAL - PAGE 2 MISSING |
|
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT MINUTE ORDER *Case Management Conference Judge: Basha, Steven M |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
718 OSC* *Order to Show Cause OSC AND TEMP RESTAINING ORDER SEE 3-2-16 MIN ORDER SCANNED Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - RENTS, ISSUES, AND PROFITS FILED BY RESOLUTION FUND MANAGEMENT |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
CIVIL LAW AND MOTION MINUTE ORDER *Ex Parte APPT OF RECEIVER NO APPEARANCE COURT DROPS FROM CALENDAR Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON1-26-16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.