Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia, Salvador, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Ford, Harold L, against Doe, John, Searle, Samantha R., Summers, David Wayne, represented by Legal Services Of, Northern California, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2016 |
Category32: Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time91 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM Notes: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION- UD |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT FILED* Notes: POSSESSION ONLY |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
564 UD COURT TRIAL *Trial: Court UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL Judge: Basha, Steven M |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: UD SHELF |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: POSSESSION ONLY |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
564 UD COURT TRIAL *Trial: Court UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL Judge: Basha, Steven M |
|
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: D6; HEARING 03/02/16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.