Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Woolworth, Denise, Woolworth, Douglas, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Piering, Robert A, against Cottonwood, H.C Inc, Cottonwood Post Acute Rehab, Kwan, Chu, Lau, K., represented by Doyle, Thomas J, La Follette, Johns, On, De Haas, Fesler, Etc, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Steven M. Basha presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management129 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2016 |
Category23: Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time802 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY ** Notes: NTC OF ENTRY OF DISM & POS |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHRED |
|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY ** Notes: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND ORDER RE ELDER ABUSE/DEPENDENT ADULT CIVIL PROTECTION ACT CAUSE OF ACTION |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE ELDER ABUSE/DEPENDENT ADULT CIVIL PROTECTION ACT CAUSE OF ACTION |
|
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited ANSWER CV/FL/PB Notes: FILED BY DEFT CHU KWAN K. LAU, M.D. |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: CHU KWAN K. LAU, MD WITH SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CCC SHEET, STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (3) ON 9/15/17 |
|
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited ANSWER CV/FL/PB Notes: DEFT COTTONWOOD H.C. INC.'S ANS TO COMPLAINT |
|
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion - New Trial DEMAND JURY TRIAL Notes: FILED BY COTTONWOOD H.C., INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.