Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lewis, Gwendolyn, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mikhov, Steve B, against General Motors Llc, represented by Arendt, Ronald A, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Samuel T. McAdam presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management130 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2016 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time403 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM Notes: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION |
|
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJ |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT MINUTE ORDER *Case Management Conference STATUS RE DISMISSAL Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MAIN SHELF |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Basha, Steven M |
|
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
*Motion COMPEL Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: OF TAKING PLTFF'S MTN OFF CALENDAR | |
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLTFF |
|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Continuance of Hearing or Case Mgmt Conference CNT CMC NTC SETTLED Notes: CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT NTC OF SETTLEMENT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.