Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fowler, Kandice, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Fowler, Christopher, Specialized Loan Servicing, Llc, represented by Wyatt, Russell A, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Samuel T. McAdam presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management133 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2016 |
Category26: Unlimited Other Real Property |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time339 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | CLAIM PAID Notes: WARRANT#37741 Date 6/23/17 Amt $3,823.68 Action Cmnt: Ck#37741 6/23/17 $3,823.68 | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
*Bail/Bond Refunded BAIL REVSL -GENERAL Notes: BAIL REVERSAL |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | CLAIM FORM TO FISCAL Notes: CLAIM TO FISCAL FOR REFUND TO PLTFF OF $3,823.68 | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION FOR RELEASE AND RETURN OF PLTFF'S UNDERTAKING RE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDERS |
|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION* Notes: JOINT STIPULATION FOR RELEASE AND RETURN OF PLTFF'S UNDERTAKING RE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
*Motion / Petition to Compel Arbitration
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT* Notes: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF GMAT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE TO PLAINTIFF CHRISTOPHER FOWLER | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Notes: DEFT GMAT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE TO PLAINTIFF CHRISTOPHER FOWLER; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.