Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Young, Graham, Young, Heather, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dreyer, Babich, Buccola & Callaham, Llp, against Jacobs, Timothy, Sacramento Perform, Marine, represented by Tiza Serrano Thompson & Associates, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management136 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2016 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial725 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time731 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference STATUS RE: DISMISSAL Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL *Trial: Jury JURY TRIAL Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Continuance of Hearing or Case Mgmt Conference CNT CMC NTC SETTLED Notes: CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT NTC OF SETTLEMENT FILED |
|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement NTC OF SETTLEMENT Notes: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE |
|
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT MINUTE ORDER *Trial Readiness Conference TRIAL READINESS CONF Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT MINUTE ORDER *Case Management Conference Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY PLNTFS GRAHAM YOUNG AND HEATHER YOUNG |
|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY DEFTS, SACRAMENTO PERFORMANCE MARINE AND TIMOTHY JACOBS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.