Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael, Lina M, against Simas, Joseph A., represented by To, Be Entered, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management402 days |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2016 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Basha, Steven M |
|
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - WITHOUT PREJUDICE- NOT ENTERED THE CASE HAS NOT BEEN REMANDED BACK TO THIS COURT |
|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJ; DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED: REMOVED FROM COURT CONTROL 4/21/16 |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS; AS TO ALL PARTIES | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: DEFTS THE STUDIO SPA SALON; JOSEPH A SIMAS WITH SUMM & CMPLT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CMC PACKET ON 3/15/2016 |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet COLL/$$ OWED/OPN BK |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed LIMITED COLLECT COMP Notes: LIMITED COLLECTIONS CASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.