Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
West Capitol Commons Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Fidler, Gary D, against Bartholmey, Paul, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Steven M. Basha presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2016 |
Category32: Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time48 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT FILED* Notes: POSSESSION ONLY |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
*Unlawful Detainer 60-Day Confidentiality Surpassed RESTORE CONF CASE Notes: RESTORE CONFIDENTIAL CASE |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: POSSESSION ONLY |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECL OF KATIE HAIR |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL IN SUPPORT* Notes: DECL OF SHAUNA GOWEN AUTHORIZED AGENT FOR WEST CAPITOL COMMONS LLC IN SUPP OF APP FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | APPLICATION* Notes: APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO WRITTEN STIP FOR ENTRY OF ORDER AND DECL OF GARY D. FIDLER IN SUPP THEREOF | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL *Trial: Court Judge: Basha, Steven M |
|
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER |
|
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: AMENDED ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS WITH SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND RELATED DOCUMENTS ON 1/24/16 AND POSTED ON 1/24/16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.