Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Leeper, David, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dreyer, Babich, Buccola & Callaham, Llp, against Springer, Lupe Delores, represented by Tiza Serrano Thompson & Associates, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management150 days |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2015 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time710 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference STATUS RE: DISMISSAL Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL *Trial: Jury JURY TRIAL 5 DAYS Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference TRIAL READINESS CONF Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Continuance of Hearing or Case Mgmt Conference CNT CMC NTC SETTLED Notes: CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT NTC OF SETTLEMENT FILED |
|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement NTC OF SETTLEMENT Notes: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE |
|
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Received FAX RECEIVED Notes: FAX TRANSMISSION RECEIVED FROM DANIEL G. SCHNEIDERMAN |
|
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference MSC Judge: Basha, Steven M |
|
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Denied ORD DENYING* Notes: ORDER DENYING DEFT'S MOT TO COMPEL MENTAL EXAM OF PLTFF |
|
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: D6 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.