Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kennard, Robert Scott, against Dennis, Timothy, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with White, Kathleen presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management390 days |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2015 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions600 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time754 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY ROBERT SCOTT KENNARD IN PLACE OF RORY W. CLARK FOR PLTFF |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES; AND FOR ORDER DEEMING ADMISSIONS ADMITTED; THIS CASE WAS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE BY THE COURT ON 6/5/17 |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
101 MOTION* *Motion REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS & MOTION TO COMPEL Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: *Order to Show Cause Post-Disposition HEARD IN D3 Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
101 MOTION* *Motion Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL IN SUPPORT* Notes: DECLARATION OF GENNA DELANY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESP TO PLTFF'S REQ FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS & 1ST SET OF INTERROGATORIES, & FOR ORDER DEEMING ADMISSIONS ADMITTED |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: DECL OF GENNA DELANY IN SUPP OF MOT FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESP TO PLTFF'S REQ FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS & 1ST SET OF INTERROGATORIES & FOR ORDER DEEMING ADMISSIONS ADMITTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.