Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Quall, Matthew W, against Timberman, Sandra L, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management399 days |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2015 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time98 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Basha, Steven M |
|
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED:SANDRA L TIMBERMAN W/ SUMM & CMPLT ON 02/12/2016. |
|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJ ENTIRE ACTION; DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED, REMOVED FROM COURT CONTROL 3/9/16 |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Bankruptcy filed (Post-judgment) BANKRUPTCY NTC RECD Notes: BANKRUPTCY NOTICE RECD W/DIST/ NO DISTRIBUTION AS TO DEFT SANDRA L TIMBERMAN |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet COLL/$$ OWED/OPN BK |
|
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed LIMITED COLLECT COMP Notes: LIMITED COLLECTIONS CASE |
|
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECL RE STATEMENT OF VENUE, FILED BY PLTFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.