Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by To, Be Entered, against Delacruz, Mailene J, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Basha, Steven presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management389 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2015 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions105 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time105 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISFIED |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: SACRAMENTO COUNTY; $8527.69 |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: $1281.04 INTEREST |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NTC CHANGE FIRM NAME Notes: SUTTELL, HAMMER & WHITE, APC TO SUTTELL & HAMMER, APC; ATTORNEY FOR PLTFF |
|
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Basha, Steven M |
|
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: YOLO $7,681.26 |
|
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: $ 434.61 INTEREST |
|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECL PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033, FILED BY PLTFF |
|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL NON MILTY STATS Notes: DECLARATION OF NON MILITARY SERVICE, FILED BY PLTFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.