Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Ll, C, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Harris, Stelios A, against Wahed, Torpakei, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management390 days |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2014 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions187 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time208 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
759 CASE MGMT CONF *Case Management Conference CASE MGMT CONF NO APPEARANCE CASE HAS GONE TO JUDGMENT COURT DROPS FROM CALENDAR Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: GRANTING USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: AGAINST TORPAKEI WAHED | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST TORPAKEI WAHED |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: RE: CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1033; INTEREST; AND EVIDENCE CODE SECTION 1550 |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Dismissal of Does DISM OF "DOES" Notes: DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT* Notes: IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 585 | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | AMENDED* Notes: PROOF OF SERVICE SERVED TORPAKEI WAHED WITH SUMM, COMPLAINT, CIV CASE CVR SHEET, DCL OF VEN, NTC OF CMC BY SERVING JANE DOE AND MAIL ON 8/24/14 | |
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: SERVED DEFT TORPAKEI WAHED WITH SUMMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON 08/24/14 AND MAILED ON 08/24/14. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.