Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Missildine, Rebecca, filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case represented by Kabanuck, Nathan J, against Vierra Farms, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2014 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time301 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM Notes: DISSMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE SUBMITTED BY DEFT. PLAINTIFF ALREADY FILED THIS DOCUMENT. |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Continuance of Hearing or Case Mgmt Conference CNT CMC NTC SETTLED Notes: CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT NTC OF SETTLEMENT FILED |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Trial Setting Conference TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE NO APPEARANCE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT WAS FILED 1-12-15 MADE IT COURT FILE AFTER HRG HELD COURT VACATES OSC ORDERED Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Conditional Settlement Filed COND SETTLEMNT AGREE Notes: CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference CASE MGMT CONF KABANUCK FOR PLTF BY C.C. PATRICK FOR DEF COU AGREE TO MEDIATE COU TO CONSULT RE POSSIBLE TRIAL DATES CONTINUED TO/FOR: TSC 1-12-15 9:00 DEPT. 2 Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FOR DEFENDENT VIERRA FARMS DBA DAVE'S PUMPKIN PATCH | |
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (FILED BY DEFENDANT VIERRA FARMS ET AL) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.