Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hu, Hening, Hu, Kelly, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Wilbur, Karyn, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 21, 2014 |
Category32: Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions17 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time21 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR PLTF PRES DEF S&T JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM HELD Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | FILED* Notes: BODY WARRANT LETTER | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR PLTF PRESENT SUBMITS PROOF OF SERVICE; IT IS FILED DEF N/P PLAINTIFF IS TO PREPARE BODY WARRANT LETTER AND FILE WITH THE COURT IN ROOM 103; REFERRED TO SELF HELP CTR 1/8/15 8:15 D-10 DEBTOR EXAM Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: KARYN WILBUR; ORDER OF EXAMINATION; 10/23/14 |
|
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Application for Order for Judgment Debtor Exam APP/ORD DEBTOR EXAM Notes: DEBTOR KARYN WILBUR FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY HENING HU AND KELLY X HU FOR HAROLD L. FORD ATTORNEY FOR PLTFFS |
|
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment JDGM ON RESERVED ISS Notes: JUDGMENT ON RESERVED ISSUES FOR PLAITNIFF HENING HU A ND KELLY X HU, AS TRUSTEES OF THE HU 2010 LIVING TRUS T DATED APRIL 21, 2010 AND AGAINST DEFENDANT KARYN WI LBUR FOR PAST-DUE RENT $4,225.88; COSTS $485.00; TOTA L JUDGMENT $4,710.88 |
|
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Unlawful Detainer 60-Day Confidentiality Surpassed RESTORE CONF CASE Notes: RESTORE CONFIDENTIAL CASE |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: RETURNED WRIT SENT TO UD SHELF |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT FILED* Notes: POSSESSION ONLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.