Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAPITAL ONE VS. MEDINA
A 06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 case was filed by Capital One Bank,, represented by Bleier, Elizabeth A, against Medina, Edward J, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. Judge Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 28, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Yolo County, CA
Category
06: Limited Breach of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 to 25,000
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Bankruptcy
Case Duration
1 month and 16 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Bankruptcy filed (Post-judgment) BANKRUPTCY NTC RECD Notes: BANKRUPTCY NOTICE RECD FILED 07-30-14; CASE 14-27780 |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ Notes: ABSTRACT ISSUED | |
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: COPY OF THE AGREEMENT MARKED EXHIBIT #1 ACCEPTED & SUBMITTED IN LIEU OF THE ORIGINAL FILED BY PLTFF | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST EDWARD J. MEDINA AKA EDWARD J. MEDINA SR | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL IN SUPPORT* Notes: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ORD ADMITTING COPIES INTO EVIDENCE IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY PLTFF |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1033 FILED BY PLTFF |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST EDWARD J. MEDINA AKA EDWARD J. MEDINA SR |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL IN SUPPORT* Notes: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT & IN SUPPORT OF ORD ADMITTING COPIES INTO EVIDENCE IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY PLTFF |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION OF PLTFFS ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTFF |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Dismissal of Does DISM OF "DOES" Notes: DISMISSAL OF DOES: AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 5 INCLUSIVE ONLY |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: DEFT WITH SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CCCS; ON 03/04/ 2014 |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed LIMITED COLLECT COMP Notes: LIMITED COLLECTIONS CASE |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet COLL/$$ OWED/OPN BK |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |