Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recovery, Associates L Lc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hunt, Michael S, against Penunuri, Patricia A, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management392 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2014 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time193 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
April 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Returned DECL OF NON SERVICE Notes: DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE AS TO PATRICIA A. PENUNURI |
|
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED Notes: SUMMONS FILED |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet COLL/$$ OWED/OPN BK |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed LIMITED COLLECT COMP Notes: LIMITED COLLECTIONS CASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.