Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Snyder, David B, against Grassi, Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2013 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time396 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference CASE MGMT CONF SOLOMON FOR PLTF PLTF MAKES ORAL MOT TO DISMISS W/OUT PREJUDICE COURT GRANTS MOTION Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Returned DECL OF NON SERVICE Notes: AMENDED DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE AS TO ELIZABETH GRASSI |
|
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Returned DECL OF NON SERVICE Notes: DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT ELIZABETH GRASSI |
|
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Returned DECL OF NON SERVICE Notes: DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE AS TO ELIZABETH GRASSI |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed LIMITED COLLECT COMP Notes: LIMITED COLLECTIONS CASE |
|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet COLL/$$ OWED/OPN BK |
|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION OF VENUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.