Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Northern Californi, A Collection Service, filed a(n) 42: Limited Other Complaint (Not Spec) - 10,000 -25,000 case represented by Cribb, Steven D, against Mossadeghian, Majid, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management119 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2013 |
Category42: Limited Other Complaint (Not Spec) - 10,000 -25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time197 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: MAJID MOSSADEGHIAN AS AN INDIVIDUAL DBA SUPERSUNNYVALE WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON 7/11/14 |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference CSAE MGMT CONF Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Filed RECEIPT OF* Notes: OF DOCUMENTS CHANGE OF VENUE, SANTA CLARA COUNTY, NEW CASE # 114CV263388 |
|
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC TRANS PAPERS/PLD Notes: NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL OF PAPERS & PLEADINGS |
|
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: GRANTING THE MOTION OF DEF MAJID MOSSADEGHIAN TO CHANGE VENUE TO SANTA CLARA COUNTY |
|
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Receipt RECT RE CHG VENUE Notes: RECEIPT RE CHANGE OF VENUE TO SANTA CLARA COUNTY FOR G13-1639 |
|
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: RETURNED ORDER AFTER HEARING AS I NCORRECT CASE # |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: 2 CHECKS FOR TRANSFER OF CASE OUT OF COURT, NEEDS AN ORDER FOR JUDGE TO SIGN |
|
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Motion MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE TO SNATA CLARA NO APPEARANCE TENTATIVE RULING ADOPTED Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTED* Notes: MOTION GRANTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.