Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recovery, Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Linn, Angie, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFall, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management389 days |
Filing DateJune 27, 2013 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions110 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time110 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Association of Counsel ASSN OF COUNSEL Notes: ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL EMILY D PIERCE ON BEHALF OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC 4330 LA JOLLA VILLAGE DRIVE STE 310 SAN DIEGO CA 92122 866 428-8102 FOR PLTFF |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT IN FULL |
|
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ | |
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: RETURNED CHECK FOR $25 AND ABSTRA CT AS FORM NOT ONE SIDE OR TUMBLED |
|
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: RETURNED ABSTRACT AS NOT TUMBLED, OR ONE SIDED CRC 2.102 |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
October 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities MEMO OF P & A Notes: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES SUPPORTING A CLERK JUDGMENT |
|
October 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: SECOND DECLARATION |
|
October 15, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: AGAINST ANGIE LINN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.