Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez, Jose N, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Rancano & Rancano, against California Oils Co, Rporation, represented by Dupree, Jamie L, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2013 |
Category35: Unlimited Other Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Time To Trial594 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time359 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury JURY TRIAL Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference TRIAL READINESS CONF Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/ JUDGMENT - MANDATORY JUDICIAL COUNCIL FORM REQUIRED (CIV-120) |
|
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE BY FAX |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: DISMISSAL DOCUMENT IS INCOMPLETE |
|
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference Plaintiff by atty Sanghera Defendant by atty Dupree Mandatory Settlement Conf set 12/12/14 @ 8:30 Dept 10 TRC set 1/9/15 @ 9:00 Dept 2 JT (15 days) set 2/2/15 @ 9:00 Dept 2 Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLTFF JOSE N MARTINEZ |
|
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MGMT STATEMENT Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA OILS CORPORATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.