Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express C, Enturion Ban K, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael, Lina M, against Maha, Alison, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy L. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management392 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions256 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time309 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment - Partial WRIT PART SATISFIED Notes: WRIT FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $492.03 VENTURA |
|
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: VENTURA COUNTY $5,391.95 |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: WRIT/SANTA BARBARA/$5,391.95 |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
November 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY LINA M. MICHAEL IN PLACE OF THE MOORE LAW GROUP FOR PLTFF |
|
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL IN SUPPORT* Notes: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT |
|
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALISON MAHA AKA ALISON MARIE MAHA, AN INDIVIDUAL |
|
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL IN SUPPORT* Notes: PLAINTIFF'S CCP SECTION 585 DECLARATION AND AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEAFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: AGAINST ALISON MAHA AKA ALISON MARIE MAHA, AN INDIVIDUAL | |
June 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: ALISON MAHA WITH FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS, FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, FIRST AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ON 4/4/13 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.