Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Heat And Frost Ins, Ulators Of N Orthern Cal, Insulation & Alli, Ed Industry Workers Of, Western States All, Ied Pension Fund, filed a(n) 42: Limited Other Complaint (Not Spec) - 10,000 -25,000 case against Intech Mechanical, Company, Inc A Californi, University Of Cali, Fornia, Davi S, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management388 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
Category42: Limited Other Complaint (Not Spec) - 10,000 -25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time38 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: returning ned as not dated or sig ned |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: INTECH MECHANICAL COMPANY INC A CALIFORNIA CO RPORATION WITH SUMMONS, COMPLAINT ON STOP NOTICE, CCC S, CASE MGMT AND THE CIVIL ADR PROGRAM PKT (2012) ON 01-04-13 BY FAX |
|
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet OTHER COMPLAINT |
|
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed LIMITED OTHER COMPL Notes: LIMITED OTHER CIVIL COMP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.