Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Renaissance Park 1, 76 Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Fidler, Gary D, against Chun, Hui Ka, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 19, 2012 |
Category32: Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions43 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time43 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ | |
February 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
*Unlawful Detainer 60-Day Confidentiality Surpassed RESTORE CONF CASE Notes: RESTORE CONFIDENTIAL CASE |
|
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment JDGM ON RESERVED ISS Notes: JUDGMENT ON RESERVED ISSUES JUDGMENT IS FOR RENAISSAN CE PARK 176, LLC AND AGAINST DEFENDANT HUI KA CHUN FO R PAST-DUE RENT $949.00; HOLDOVER DAMAGES $1,185.60; ATTORNEY FEES $200.00; COSTS $475.00; TOTAL $2,809.60 |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: ntu letter of 12-24-12 to Hui Ka Chun, not deliverabl e as addressed unable to forward |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: file away |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: notice of time & place of ud trial to Hui Ka Chun ret urned; not deliverable as addressed; unable to forwar d |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: ex parte min order of 01-31-13 to Hui Ka chun, return to sender, not deliverable as addressed; unable to f orward |
|
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request to enter default filed REQ FOR CT JDGM Notes: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT |
|
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT |
|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: UD SHELF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.