Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yoon, Hyoung Yoon, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Chang, Celia H Md, Chib, Priya, Dignity Health A C, Alifornia Co Rporation Do, Dignity Health Med, Ical Foundat Ion, A Calif, Dyer, Everett B Iii Md, (total of 10) See All represented by Donnelly & Nelson, Llp, Doyle, Thomas J, Galloway, Lucchese & Everson, Hardy Erich Brown & Wilson, Muro, Mark A, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Basha, Steven presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
Category23: Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Time To Trial510 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time990 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Basha, Steven M |
|
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM Notes: AS TO DEFT.'S EVERETT B. DYER, M.D.; MEDICAL CLINIC OF SACRAMENTO, INC. DBA MERCY MEDICAL GROUP, INC.' ONLY |
|
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM Notes: ENTIRE ACTION, FILED BY DEFT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CA |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE |
|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM Notes: RE DIGNITY HEALTH, DIGNITY HEALTH MEDICAL FOUNDATION AND HENRY L KANO |
|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Party Dismissed DISM PARTY Notes: AS TO EVERETT B DYER; MEDICAL CLINIC OF SACRAMENTO |
|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: minors compromise | |
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Party Dismissed DISM PARTY Notes: AS TO DEFTS PRIYA CHIB, MD; AND WOODLAND CLINIC MEDICAL GROUP ONLY |
|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL W/ PREJ; DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED AS TO HENRY KANO, MD; PARTY ALREADY DISMISSED 8/7/15 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.