Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Harvego, Deborah S, against Cummings, Jeremiah E, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management391 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions206 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time206 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISFIED SACRAMENTO COUNTY |
|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: YOLO $18,179.93 |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NTC CHANGE FIRM NAME Notes: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CONTACT INFORMATION: NEUHEISEL LAW FIRM PC TO GURSTEL LAW FIRM PC 9320 EAST RAINTREE DRIVE, SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85260 TEL 877-344-4002 FAX 877-750-6335 |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: TOTAL $0, CREDIT $0, INTEREST $5,876.43 |
|
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISFIED/LOS ANGELES COUNTY |
|
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ | |
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: SACRAMENTO COUNTY $14,557.36 |
|
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: LOS ANGELES COUNTY $14,557.36 |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: $2,253.86 INTEREST |
|
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.