Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Ll, C, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Snyder, David B, against Ramirez, Fernando, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management391 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions125 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time339 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment - Partial WRIT PART SATISFIED Notes: REMAINING BALANCE $6,761.43 |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: SACRAMENTO COUNTY FOR 5659.00 |
|
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference CASE MGMT CONF NO APPEARANCE THIS MATTER HAS GONE TO JUDGMENT COURT DROPS FROM CALENDAR Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
November 22, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: GRANTING USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS | |
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Dismissal of Does DISM OF "DOES" |
|
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST FERNANDO RAMIREZ |
|
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: AGAINST DEFT FERNANDO RAMIREZ | |
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT* Notes: IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.