Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank ,, N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Reese, Harlan M, against Egle, Cheryl, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management392 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time140 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NTC CHANGE/ADDRESS Notes: REESE LAW GROUP- 3168 LIONSHEAD AVE, CARLSBAD, CA 92010 PHONE: 760-842-5850 FAX; 760-842-5865 ATTY FOR PLTFF |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ | |
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: ORDER ACCEPTING IMAGED DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS UNDER EVIDENCE CODE 1553 | |
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585 |
|
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event | FILED* Notes: CASE SUMMARY | |
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Dismissal of Does DISM OF "DOES" Notes: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 10 ONLY |
|
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.