Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Moore, Harvey M, against Mc Carthy, Linda C, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management386 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time593 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISIFIED - SACRAMENTO |
|
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISIFIED SACRAMENTO |
|
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ Notes: ABSTRACT ISSUED | |
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: SACRAMENTO CO FOR 15638.20 |
|
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: INT $958.39 |
|
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: RETURNING ABSTRACT AS NAME OF CRE DITOR NOT THE SAME AS SHOWN ON JUDGMENT |
|
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY ** Notes: OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLNTFF |
|
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.